+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ floor amendment # 2
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 20, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 18, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
March 10, 2016: Senate/ floor amendment # 2
March 10, 2016: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
March 10, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
February 22, 2016: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
February 22, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 22, 2016: House/ uncircled
February 12, 2016: House/ circled
February 2, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor