+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (55)
On March 24, 2020 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 23, 2020 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 20, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- House/ recalled by House
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ recalled by Senate
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (11)
March 3, 2020: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
March 2, 2020: Senate/ uncircled
March 2, 2020: Senate/ circled
March 2, 2020: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
March 2, 2020: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 27, 2020: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 21, 2020: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
February 14, 2020: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 14, 2020: House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
February 5, 2020: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 5, 2020: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor