+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (50)
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ circled
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ substitute
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ to House
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- House/ to Senate
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- House/ substituted
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- House/ substituted
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ substituted/ amended
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On January 27, 2007 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2007: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 8
February 28, 2007: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 20, 2007: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 4
February 7, 2007: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor