+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- House/ committee return to Rules Committee
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor