+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (38)
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
- Senate/ to House
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
- House/ amended
- House/ uncircled
- House/ amended
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ motion to reconsider/ passed
- House/ motion to reconsider
- House/ failed
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ substituted
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 25, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 24, 2008 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
February 29, 2008: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 8
February 25, 2008: House/ failed
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 36
- Absent: 3
February 15, 2008: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 5
February 13, 2008: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor