+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ to Senate
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House/ 2nd reading
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment # 2
Passed
House Amendment # 1
Prepared
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 2014: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 7
March 12, 2014: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
March 11, 2014: Senate/ floor amendment
March 11, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 29
March 7, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 4
March 4, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor