+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 8
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 7
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 5
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment failed # 2
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (12)
February 24, 2017: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 23, 2017: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 22, 2017: Senate/ floor amendment # 8
February 22, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 14, 2017: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 7
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
February 14, 2017: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
February 14, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
February 13, 2017: Senate Comm - Held
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 13, 2017: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 5
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 7, 2017: House/ floor amendment failed # 2
February 7, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 4
January 30, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor