+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 6, 2009 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On March 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 2nd
On March 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ read 2nd time
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment # 2
Prepared
Senate Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (6)
March 9, 2009: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 5, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
March 2, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
February 23, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 13, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor