+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 21, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Vetoed
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Received from House for Enrolling
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt fav/ substituted/ amended
- House/ read 2nd time
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 1
February 22, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
February 17, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 6
February 2, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor