+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ amended
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ lifted from Rules Comm
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- House/ to Senate
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- House/ under suspension of the rules
- House/ received from General Counsel
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ read 1st & 2nd (Under Suspension)
On January 27, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Amendments (5)
House Amendment # 2
Passed
House Amendment # 3
Passed
Senate Amendment # 5
Passed
Senate Amendment # 7
Passed
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
February 27, 2007: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 5
February 27, 2007: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 3
February 27, 2007: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor