+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 14, 2022 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 2022: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 24, 2022: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 22, 2022: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
February 10, 2022: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 2, 2022: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
February 2, 2022: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1