+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (50)
On March 17, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ received from House
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
On February 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ place back 3rd
- Senate/ motion to reconsider passed
- Senate/ received from House
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ recalled by Senate
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- House/ filed
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ failed
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ amended
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 5, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On December 22, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On December 19, 2005 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Amendments (4)
Senate Amendment # 2
Passed
Senate Amendment # 3
Failed
House Amendment # 1
Passed
Senate Amendment # 4
Prepared
+ − Votes (7)
February 27, 2006: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 5
February 24, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
February 14, 2006: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 2
February 9, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
February 3, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 1
January 30, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 5
January 18, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor