+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 23, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ under suspension of the rules
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 29, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On December 28, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On December 22, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 14, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 10, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On December 7, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On November 19, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Votes (4)
February 4, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 3
February 3, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 1, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
January 26, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor