+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 24, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2015: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 19, 2015: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
February 19, 2015: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 10, 2015: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 3, 2015: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor