+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ received from House
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Amendments (3)
Senate Committee Amendment 2
Passed
House Committee Amendment 2
Passed
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (12)
March 8, 2017: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2017: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 2, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
March 2, 2017: Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
March 2, 2017: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
February 24, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
February 24, 2017: House/ circled
February 24, 2017: House/ uncircled
February 10, 2017: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
February 10, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
February 10, 2017: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
January 31, 2017: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor