+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
January 30, 2015: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor