+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
February 29, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 23, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
February 11, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 1, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor