+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
March 5, 2012: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
February 29, 2012: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 24, 2012: House/ floor amendment
February 24, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 14, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor