+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ uncircled
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 3rd
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
- Senate/ pass 2nd (Suspension
- Senate/ read 2nd (Suspension)
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt sent to Rules Committee
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substituted
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- House/ to Senate
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ substituted
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ read 2nd time
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Failed
+ − Votes (5)
March 12, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
March 10, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd (Suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 4, 2009: Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 3
February 12, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor