+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ held
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (8)
March 4, 2019: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
March 1, 2019: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 29
February 28, 2019: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
February 25, 2019: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
February 25, 2019: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 25, 2019: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 11, 2019: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
January 31, 2019: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor