+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 2011: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
March 8, 2011: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 8
March 3, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 28, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor