+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Prepared
+ − Vote
February 25, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor