+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (49)
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment failed
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ held
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (12)
March 5, 2021: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 22
- Absent: 11
March 4, 2021: Senate/ circled
March 4, 2021: Senate/ uncircled
March 4, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 7
March 1, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 1, 2021: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 8, 2021: House/ uncircled
February 8, 2021: House/ floor amendment failed
February 8, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 30
- Absent: 3
February 8, 2021: House/ circled
February 2, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 11
February 2, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor