+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
March 13, 2019: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
March 7, 2019: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 26, 2019: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 3
February 20, 2019: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 5
February 20, 2019: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor