+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 8, 2016 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 16, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
February 9, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 5
February 9, 2016: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
January 28, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 13
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor