+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 1
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (9)
February 11, 2022: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 10, 2022: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 8, 2022: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
February 2, 2022: House/ uncircled
February 2, 2022: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 2, 2022: House/ floor amendment # 1
February 2, 2022: House/ circled
January 26, 2022: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
January 26, 2022: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2