+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ placed on Time Certain Calendar
- House/ lifted from Rules
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 8, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
February 9, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 5
February 2, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor