+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ to House
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ lifted from Rules
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- House/ substituted
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 1st, 2nd, 3rd readings/ suspension
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ held for reconsideration
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor