+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ failed
- House/ uncircled
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 29, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
February 9, 2017: House/ failed
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 40
- Absent: 5
February 9, 2017: House/ uncircled
February 6, 2017: House/ circled
January 26, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
January 26, 2017: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
January 26, 2017: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor