+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ failed
- House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
House Committee Amendment 2
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
February 4, 2021: House/ failed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 36
- Absent: 7
February 4, 2021: House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
January 29, 2021: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 4
January 29, 2021: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- Yeas: 13
- Absent: 3
January 29, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 3
January 29, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 13
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor