+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ returned to Rules
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
March 5, 2013: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 14
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor