+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ substituted
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Prepared
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2014: House/ circled
March 6, 2014: House/ substituted
February 26, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor