+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
House Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (7)
March 2, 2012: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
March 1, 2012: Senate/ circled
February 29, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 24, 2012: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 17, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 17, 2012: House/ floor amendment
February 8, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor