+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment failed
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 7, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 19, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
On December 10, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 1
Passed
House Amendment # 2
Failed
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 13
February 28, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 10
February 27, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
February 11, 2013: House/ floor amendment failed
February 11, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 30
- Absent: 4
February 5, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor