+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 8, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 3, 2016: Senate/ circled
March 3, 2016: Senate/ uncircled
March 3, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 4
March 2, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 10
February 25, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
February 18, 2016: Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 3
February 11, 2016: House/ uncircled
February 11, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 2
February 9, 2016: House/ circled
January 28, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor