+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ received from Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
February 12, 2016: House/ floor amendment
February 12, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 1
February 2, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor