+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 2012: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 22, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 22, 2012: Senate/ uncircled
February 22, 2012: Senate/ circled
February 17, 2012: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 1
February 13, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 8, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor