+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ received from Senate
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 8, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
February 16, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
February 8, 2021: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 4
February 8, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 4