+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 17, 2008 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ received from House
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- House/ to Senate
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ substitute/ amended/ Consent
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ substituted
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On January 24, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 22, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 21, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 14, 2008 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2008: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 65
- Absent: 10
February 19, 2008: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 14, 2008: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
February 7, 2008: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 63
- Absent: 12
January 29, 2008: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 13
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor