+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 2
- House/ uncircled
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (12)
February 26, 2016: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 5
February 25, 2016: Senate/ uncircled
February 25, 2016: Senate/ circled
February 25, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 24, 2016: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
February 24, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 5
February 17, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
February 12, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 12, 2016: House/ uncircled
February 12, 2016: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 2
February 11, 2016: House/ circled
February 1, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor