+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (62)
On March 26, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On March 7, 2010 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 6, 2010 in the House:
- House/ motion to reconsider passed
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 5, 2010 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
- House/ motion to reconsider
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 5, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ substituted by Rules
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ substituted
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment # 2
Passed
Senate Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (5)
March 9, 2010: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 63
- Absent: 12
March 4, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 22, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
February 4, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 1, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor