+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 21, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On December 20, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor