+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 18, 2005 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
- House/ to Governor
On March 8, 2005 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Received from House for Enrolling
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ substitute
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ pass 2nd
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 15, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ amended
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 29, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 2005: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 8
March 1, 2005: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 28, 2005: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 21, 2005: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
February 15, 2005: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 7
February 7, 2005: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor