+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ substituted
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 2007: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 23, 2007: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 9
February 16, 2007: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 2
- Absent: 4
February 13, 2007: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
January 30, 2007: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor