+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd (Suspension)
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
- Senate/ pass 2nd (Suspension
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On March 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt fav/ substituted/ amended
- House/ read 2nd time
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ substituted by Rules Committee
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (5)
March 11, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 9
March 10, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd (Suspension
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
March 3, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 18, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor