+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 1st, 2nd, 3rd readings/ suspension
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 2015: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 27, 2015: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 3
February 20, 2015: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 5
February 11, 2015: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 3, 2015: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor