+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
- House/ to Governor
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ to Senate
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ amended/ placed on Consent
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from LFA
- House Comm - Not Considered
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2004: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
February 18, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 13, 2004: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor