+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 5
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 8, 2021 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment 5
Passed
Senate Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (10)
February 19, 2021: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
February 18, 2021: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 17, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 10, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
February 10, 2021: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 8
February 5, 2021: House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
February 5, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
January 29, 2021: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 5
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 3
January 29, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 3
January 29, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 3