+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (55)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ received from House
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment # 1
Prepared
Senate Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (11)
March 12, 2014: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
March 12, 2014: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
March 11, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 11, 2014: Senate/ floor amendment
March 4, 2014: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
February 28, 2014: House/ floor amendment
February 28, 2014: House/ circled
February 28, 2014: House/ uncircled
February 21, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 5
February 19, 2014: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 14
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor