+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- House/ committee return to Rules Committee
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Vote
January 26, 2006: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor